Refine Your Search
Add filters:
Use filters to refine the search results.
- previous
- 1
- next
Results 1-9 of 9 (Search time: 0.007 seconds).
Date | Title | Type | View |
---|---|---|---|
19-Jul-2018 | Consequent on his election to the Rajya Sabha, Shri Jose K. Mani, an elected Member from the Kottayam Parliamentary Constituency of Kerala ceased to be member of the Lok Sabha with effect from 14 June, 2018. | Part 2(Other than Questions And Answers) | View... |
19-Jul-2018 | Shri Baijayant Jay Panda, an elected member from the Kendrapara Parliamentary Constituency of Odisha resigned from the Membership of Lok Sabha w.e.f. 18.07.2018. | Part 2(Other than Questions And Answers) | View... |
18-Jul-2018 | Sh. B.S. Yeddyurappa, an elected member from Shimoga constituency of Karnataka | Part 2(Other than Questions And Answers) | View... |
17-Dec-2018 | Sh. Ch. Malla Reddy, an elected member from Malkaganj Parliamentary constituency of Telangana resigned from the membership of Lok Sabha w.e.f. 14 December, 2018. | Part 2(Other than Questions And Answers) | View... |
14-Dec-2018 | Sh. Thupstan Chhewang, an elected member from the Ladakh Parliamentary Constituency of Jammu & Kashmir resigned from the membership of Lok Sabha with effect from 13 December, 2018. | Part 2(Other than Questions And Answers) | View... |
12-Dec-2018 | Shri Canrad Kongkal Sangma, an elected Member from the Tura Parliamentary Constituency of Meghalaya resigned from the membership of Lok Sabha w.e.f. 4 September, 2018. | Part 2(Other than Questions And Answers) | View... |
27-Dec-2018 | Shri Manohar Untwal an elected Member from Dewas Parliamentary Constituency of Madhya Pradesh | Part 2(Other than Questions And Answers) | View... |
18-Dec-2018 | Shri Balka Suman, an elected Member from the Peddapalle Parliamentary Constituency of Telangana resigned from the membership of Lok Sabha w.e.f. 17 December, 2018. | Part 2(Other than Questions And Answers) | View... |
5-Mar-2018 | Shri Neiphiu Rio, an elected member from the Nagaland Parliamentary Constituency of Nagaland resigned from the membership of Lok Sabha w.e.f. 22 February, 2018. | Part 2(Other than Questions And Answers) | View... |